U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Delaware

delaware Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Delaware
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:19-cr-00064-1
  • Case Name: U.S. v. Isip, Jr.
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 02, 2025: [Reply to the Response to Motion]
January, 2023
  • January 18, 2023: [--Transcript]
December, 2022
  • December 30, 2022: [Letter]
  • December 06, 2022: [Letter]
November, 2022
  • November 22, 2022: [- - Notice of Docketing ROA - 3rd Circuit]
  • November 22, 2022: [- NOTICE OF APPEAL- Final Judgment]
  • November 16, 2022: [Judgment]
  • November 10, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • November 10, 2022: [Dismiss]
  • November 10, 2022: [Sentencing]
  • November 09, 2022: [Dismiss]
September, 2022
  • September 22, 2022: [Status Conference - Deft. not present]
August, 2022
  • August 25, 2022: [Letter]
  • August 23, 2022: [Order]
  • August 23, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 19, 2022: [Status Report ]
  • August 18, 2022: [Letter]
  • August 10, 2022: [Letter]
  • August 08, 2022: [Notice re Attorney Appearance - Requesting Removal of Co-Counsel]
July, 2022
  • July 29, 2022: [Order]
  • July 29, 2022: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • July 27, 2022: [Order for Forfeiture of Property]
  • July 27, 2022: [Letter]
  • July 27, 2022: [Withdraw Plea of Guilty]
  • July 27, 2022: [Dismiss]
  • July 27, 2022: [Forfeiture - Preliminary Order]
  • July 24, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • July 20, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • July 15, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
June, 2022
  • June 06, 2022: [Letter]
May, 2022
  • May 26, 2022: [Letter]
  • May 13, 2022: [Letter]
April, 2022
  • April 26, 2022: [Order Scheduling Sentencing]
  • April 14, 2022: [Order]
  • April 14, 2022: [Opinion - Memorandum Opinion]
  • April 07, 2022: [--Transcript]
March, 2022
  • March 14, 2022: [Letter]
  • March 04, 2022: [Letter]
February, 2022
  • February 25, 2022: [Letter]
  • February 25, 2022: [Exhibit List ]
  • February 25, 2022: [Evidentiary Hearing]
  • February 02, 2022: [Order]
January, 2022
  • January 27, 2022: [--Transcript]
  • January 24, 2022: [Reply to the Response to Motion]
December, 2021
  • December 27, 2021: [Letter]
  • December 03, 2021: [Letter]
November, 2021
  • November 22, 2021: [Order]
  • November 21, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • November 09, 2021: [Response to Motion]
September, 2021
  • September 27, 2021: [Letter]
  • September 22, 2021: [Letter]
  • September 14, 2021: [Letter]
August, 2021
  • August 31, 2021: [Order]
  • August 31, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 31, 2021: [Letter]
  • August 12, 2021: [Order]
  • August 12, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • August 11, 2021: [Withdraw Plea of Guilty]
May, 2021
  • May 26, 2021: [Order]
  • May 26, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 21, 2021: [Letter]
  • May 18, 2021: [Letter]
April, 2021
  • April 22, 2021: [Status Report ]
  • April 15, 2021: [Letter]
  • April 05, 2021: [Letter]
March, 2021
  • March 26, 2021: [Order]
  • March 26, 2021: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • March 26, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • March 26, 2021: [Miscellaneous Hearing]
  • March 15, 2021: [Letter]
  • March 10, 2021: [Order]
  • March 10, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 09, 2021: [Letter]
February, 2021
  • February 26, 2021: [Withdraw Plea of Guilty]
October, 2020
  • October 07, 2020: [Order]
  • October 07, 2020: [Continue]
September, 2020
  • September 30, 2020: [--Transcript]
  • September 29, 2020: [Sealed Document]
  • September 29, 2020: [Seal]
July, 2020
  • July 14, 2020: [Order]
  • July 14, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 10, 2020: [Continue]
April, 2020
  • April 07, 2020: [Order]
  • April 07, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 07, 2020: [Continue]
February, 2020
  • February 11, 2020: [Order]
  • February 11, 2020: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • February 11, 2020: [Order Scheduling Sentencing]
  • February 11, 2020: [Exhibit to a Document]
  • February 11, 2020: [Plea Agreement Filed]
  • February 11, 2020: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • February 03, 2020: [Order]
  • February 03, 2020: [Telephone Conference]
  • February 03, 2020: [--Transcript]
January, 2020
  • January 30, 2020: [Order - Memorandum and Order]
  • January 29, 2020: [Continue]
  • January 23, 2020: [- CORRECTING ENTRY]
  • January 23, 2020: [Order]
  • January 22, 2020: [Reply to the Response to Motion]
  • January 22, 2020: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • January 22, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • January 21, 2020: [Protective Order]
  • January 07, 2020: [Letter]
  • January 06, 2020: [Exhibit List ]
  • January 06, 2020: [Motion Hearing]
  • January 06, 2020: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • January 03, 2020: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • January 02, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • January 02, 2020: [Order - Memorandum and Order]
  • January 02, 2020: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
December, 2019
  • December 16, 2019: [Order]
  • December 16, 2019: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • December 16, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
November, 2019
  • November 29, 2019: [Reply to the Response to Motion]
  • November 18, 2019: [Extension of Time to File Document]
  • November 06, 2019: [Response to Motion]
October, 2019
  • October 17, 2019: [Dismiss/Speedy Trial]
  • October 17, 2019: [Suppress Statements]
September, 2019
  • September 06, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • September 05, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
August, 2019
  • August 05, 2019: [1 - Terminate Deadlines]
July, 2019
  • July 25, 2019: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • July 23, 2019: [Letter]
  • July 22, 2019: [CJA 20 - Oral Appointment]
  • July 19, 2019: [Stay]
  • July 10, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
June, 2019
  • June 28, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 28, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • June 28, 2019: [Order to Continue - Pretrial Motion Filing]
  • June 28, 2019: [Order]
  • June 28, 2019: [Status Conference - Deft. present]
  • June 21, 2019: [Letter]
  • June 12, 2019: [Order to Continue - Pretrial Motion Filing]
  • June 12, 2019: [Oral Order]
  • June 12, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 12, 2019: [Remark]
  • June 10, 2019: [Withdraw as Attorney]
May, 2019
  • May 21, 2019: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • May 20, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • May 17, 2019: [Protective Order]
  • May 16, 2019: [Order to Continue - Pretrial Motion Filing]
  • May 16, 2019: [Arraignment - Not Guilty Plea]
  • May 15, 2019: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • May 15, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 14, 2019: [Case Unsealed]
  • May 14, 2019: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
  • May 14, 2019: [Unseal Case]
  • May 14, 2019: [Indictment Unsealed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.