open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Delaware

DELAWARE PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Delaware
    Case Number:1:19-cv-00905
    Party Name:MQ Gaming, LLC et al v. LEGO Systems, Inc. et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [1 - Terminate Scheduling Order Deadlines]
    Date Published:June 10, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Set/Reset Scheduling Order Deadlines]
    Date Published:May 27, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Telephone Conference]
    Date Published:May 11, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Claim Construction Chart]
    Date Published:May 04, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
    Date Published:April 30, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:February 13, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice - Other]
    Date Published:February 13, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Stipulation-General (See Motion List for Stipulation to Extend Time)]
    Date Published:February 13, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Case Referred to Mediation - Magistrate Judge only]
    Date Published:January 27, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Protective Order]
    Date Published:January 27, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order Setting Teleconference]
    Date Published:January 23, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Scheduling Order - Patent]
    Date Published:January 23, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Proposed Order]
    Date Published:January 17, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [- Transcript]
    Date Published:January 14, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Scheduling Conference]
    Date Published:January 13, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Brief - Reply]
    Date Published:December 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Brief - Answering Brief in Opposition]
    Date Published:December 09, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Service]
    Date Published:December 04, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order Setting Scheduling Conference]
    Date Published:December 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Letter]
    Date Published:November 25, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Brief - Opening Brief in Support]
    Date Published:November 25, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Miscellaneous Relief]
    Date Published:November 25, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice re Attorney Appearance - Requesting Removal of Co-Counsel]
    Date Published:November 07, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Oral Order]
    Date Published:October 21, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Answer to Counterclaim]
    Date Published:October 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Answer to Complaint]
    Date Published:September 27, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Counterclaim]
    Date Published:September 27, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Add Attorneys - PHV only]
    Date Published:September 24, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
    Date Published:September 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [SO ORDERED]
    Date Published:August 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set/Reset Answer Deadline]
    Date Published:August 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Stipulation to EXTEND Time]
    Date Published:August 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Appearance]
    Date Published:August 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons Returned Executed]
    Date Published:August 07, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons Issued]
    Date Published:August 07, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
    Date Published:May 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [No Summons Issued]
    Date Published:May 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Disclosure Statement - Rule 7.1]
    Date Published:May 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Patent/Trademark Report to Commissioner of Patents]
    Date Published:May 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Magistrate Consent Forms]
    Date Published:May 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Complaint]
    Date Published:May 15, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.ded.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?68809
Post Your Comment or Question
1 x 3 =