U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Delaware

delaware Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Delaware
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:19-cr-00068-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Henry
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2025
  • March 25, 2025: [Letter]
June, 2020
  • June 18, 2020: [Order]
  • June 17, 2020: [Forfeiture - Final Order]
March, 2020
  • March 16, 2020: [Judgment]
  • March 06, 2020: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • March 06, 2020: [Dismiss]
  • March 06, 2020: [Sentencing]
  • March 02, 2020: [Letter]
February, 2020
  • February 26, 2020: [Declaration]
  • February 25, 2020: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • February 21, 2020: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
December, 2019
  • December 23, 2019: [Order]
  • December 18, 2019: [Forfeiture - Preliminary Order]
November, 2019
  • November 04, 2019: [Order Scheduling Sentencing]
October, 2019
  • October 23, 2019: [Plea Agreement Filed]
  • October 23, 2019: [Sealed Document]
  • October 23, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • October 22, 2019: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • October 22, 2019: [Oral Order]
  • October 22, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 07, 2019: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • October 07, 2019: [Order]
  • October 07, 2019: [Order Scheduling Guilty Plea - Rule 11]
September, 2019
  • September 13, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 13, 2019: [Order]
  • September 13, 2019: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • September 12, 2019: [Telephone Conference]
  • September 03, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • September 03, 2019: [Order to Continue - Pretrial Motion Filing]
August, 2019
  • August 30, 2019: [Extension of Time to File Document]
  • August 07, 2019: [Order of Detention]
July, 2019
  • July 01, 2019: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • July 01, 2019: [Order to Continue - Pretrial Motion Filing]
  • July 01, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 01, 2019: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • July 01, 2019: [Order]
June, 2019
  • June 26, 2019: [Extension of Time to File Document]
  • June 24, 2019: [Sealed Motion]
  • June 03, 2019: [Order]
  • June 03, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 03, 2019: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
May, 2019
  • May 31, 2019: [Order to Continue - Pretrial Motion Filing]
  • May 31, 2019: [Arraignment - Not Guilty Plea]
  • May 31, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • May 31, 2019: [Writ Returned Executed]
  • May 24, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • May 23, 2019: [Detain Pending Trial]
  • May 23, 2019: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • May 23, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • May 22, 2019: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • May 21, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 21, 2019: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued]
  • May 21, 2019: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • May 21, 2019: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • May 20, 2019: [Order on Motion for Warrant]
  • May 20, 2019: [Warrant ]
  • May 20, 2019: [Redacted Document]
  • May 20, 2019: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.