U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Delaware

delaware Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Delaware
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:19-cr-00066-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Vastardis et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Brief/Memorandum in Opposition]
  • April 16, 2025: [Early Termination of Probation]
July, 2022
  • July 13, 2022: [Exhibit List ]
June, 2022
  • June 06, 2022: [- - Notice of Docketing ROA - 3rd Circuit]
  • June 03, 2022: [--Transcript]
May, 2022
  • May 31, 2022: [- APPEAL - Credit Card Payment (Attorneys Only)]
  • May 31, 2022: [- NOTICE OF APPEAL- Final Judgment]
  • May 18, 2022: [Judgment]
  • May 12, 2022: [Sentencing]
  • May 11, 2022: [Sentencing]
  • May 05, 2022: [Order]
  • May 04, 2022: [~Util - Interpreter Requested]
April, 2022
  • April 26, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • April 20, 2022: [Notice - Other]
  • April 20, 2022: [Declaration]
  • April 20, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
February, 2022
  • February 01, 2022: [~Util - Interpreter Requested]
  • February 01, 2022: [Order Scheduling Sentencing]
January, 2022
  • January 28, 2022: [USCA Mandate]
October, 2020
  • October 07, 2020: [USCA Order Terminating Appeal]
July, 2020
  • July 21, 2020: [Acknowledgment of Receipt]
June, 2020
  • June 30, 2020: [- - Notice of Docketing ROA - 3rd Circuit]
  • June 20, 2020: [- NOTICE OF APPEAL- Final Judgment]
  • June 02, 2020: [--Transcript]
May, 2020
  • May 29, 2020: [- - Notice of Docketing ROA - 3rd Circuit]
  • May 21, 2020: [- APPEAL - Credit Card Payment (Attorneys Only)]
  • May 21, 2020: [- NOTICE OF APPEAL- Final Judgment]
  • May 08, 2020: [Judgment]
  • May 07, 2020: [Transcript Request]
  • May 07, 2020: [Sentencing]
  • May 07, 2020: [Remark]
  • May 05, 2020: [Brief/Memorandum in Opposition]
  • May 04, 2020: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
April, 2020
  • April 23, 2020: [Status Report ]
  • April 20, 2020: [Order - Memorandum and Order]
  • April 13, 2020: [Reply Brief/Memorandum]
  • April 06, 2020: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
March, 2020
  • March 30, 2020: [~Util - Interpreter Requested]
  • March 27, 2020: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • March 26, 2020: [Order]
  • March 26, 2020: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • March 26, 2020: [Opinion - Memorandum Opinion]
  • March 25, 2020: [--Transcript]
  • March 23, 2020: [Downward Departure]
  • March 23, 2020: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • March 20, 2020: [Reply to the Response to Motion]
  • March 20, 2020: [Response to Motion]
  • March 18, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
February, 2020
  • February 06, 2020: [Reply Brief/Memorandum]
January, 2020
  • January 30, 2020: [Order]
  • January 30, 2020: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • January 23, 2020: [Brief/Memorandum in Opposition]
  • January 16, 2020: [Order]
  • January 14, 2020: [Extension of Time to File Document]
  • January 10, 2020: [~Util - Interpreter Requested]
  • January 10, 2020: [Order Scheduling Sentencing]
  • January 02, 2020: [Acquittal]
  • January 02, 2020: [New Trial ]
December, 2019
  • December 27, 2019: [Exhibit List ]
  • December 26, 2019: [Exhibit List ]
  • December 20, 2019: [Jury Notes (Sealed)]
  • December 19, 2019: [Order for Jury Lunch]
  • December 19, 2019: [Redacted Document]
  • December 19, 2019: [Jury Verdict]
  • December 18, 2019: [Jury Instructions ]
  • December 16, 2019: [In Limine]
  • December 15, 2019: [In Limine]
  • December 15, 2019: [Jury Instructions - Proposed]
  • December 15, 2019: [Brief/Memorandum in Opposition]
  • December 15, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • December 14, 2019: [Jury Instructions - Proposed]
  • December 13, 2019: [Transcript Request]
  • December 13, 2019: [Jury Trial Held]
  • December 13, 2019: [Jury Instructions - Proposed]
  • December 12, 2019: [Brief/Memorandum in Opposition]
  • December 11, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • December 11, 2019: [Jury Instructions ]
  • December 10, 2019: [Jury Selection]
  • December 09, 2019: [Jury Instructions ]
  • December 09, 2019: [Voir Dire Questions]
  • December 08, 2019: [Brief/Memorandum in Opposition]
  • December 06, 2019: [Compel]
  • December 06, 2019: [Jury Instructions ]
  • December 04, 2019: [In Limine]
  • December 04, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • December 02, 2019: [In Limine]
  • December 02, 2019: [--Transcript]
November, 2019
  • November 26, 2019: [Jury Instructions - Proposed]
  • November 26, 2019: [Transcript Request]
  • November 26, 2019: [Pretrial Conference]
  • November 24, 2019: [Quash]
  • November 22, 2019: [Telephone Conference]
  • November 21, 2019: [Jury Instructions - Proposed]
  • November 21, 2019: [Brief/Memorandum in Opposition]
  • November 21, 2019: [Voir Dire - Proposed]
  • November 21, 2019: [In Limine]
  • November 21, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • November 20, 2019: [Continue]
  • November 14, 2019: [Order - Memorandum and Order]
  • November 12, 2019: [Order - Memorandum and Order]
October, 2019
  • October 28, 2019: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • October 03, 2019: [Letter]
September, 2019
  • September 27, 2019: [Brief/Memorandum in Opposition]
  • September 27, 2019: [Brief/Memorandum in Support]
  • September 18, 2019: [Reply to the Response to Motion]
  • September 13, 2019: [--Transcript]
  • September 10, 2019: [Brief/Memorandum in Opposition]
  • September 05, 2019: [Notice - Other]
  • September 05, 2019: [Witness List]
  • September 05, 2019: [Evidentiary Hearing]
  • September 04, 2019: [Transcript Request]
August, 2019
  • August 28, 2019: [Reply Brief/Memorandum]
  • August 28, 2019: [Leave to File Document]
  • August 13, 2019: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Document]
  • August 12, 2019: [Reply Brief/Memorandum]
  • August 12, 2019: [Leave to File Document]
  • August 09, 2019: [Exhibit to a Document]
  • August 05, 2019: [Reply to the Response to Motion]
July, 2019
  • July 22, 2019: [Response to Motion]
  • July 22, 2019: [Oral Order]
  • July 22, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • July 22, 2019: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • July 19, 2019: [Brief/Memorandum in Support]
  • July 19, 2019: [Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction]
  • July 19, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • July 01, 2019: [- CORRECTING ENTRY]
  • July 01, 2019: [Suppress Evidence]
  • July 01, 2019: [Strike]
  • July 01, 2019: [Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction]
  • July 01, 2019: [Exclude]
  • July 01, 2019: [Hearing]
  • July 01, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • July 01, 2019: [Brief/Memorandum in Support]
  • July 01, 2019: [Compel]
June, 2019
  • June 25, 2019: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • June 25, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • June 24, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 11, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 11, 2019: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • June 11, 2019: [Order]
  • June 10, 2019: [Scheduling Conference - Deft. not present]
  • June 06, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 06, 2019: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • June 06, 2019: [Order]
  • June 06, 2019: [Letter]
  • June 05, 2019: [Response to Motion]
  • June 05, 2019: [Hearing]
  • June 03, 2019: [Certificate of Good Standing]
May, 2019
  • May 31, 2019: [Waiver of Presence at Arraignment]
  • May 31, 2019: [Acknowledgment of Receipt]
  • May 31, 2019: [Order to Continue - Pretrial Motion Filing]
  • May 31, 2019: [Arraignment - Not Guilty Plea]
  • May 24, 2019: [Certificate of Good Standing]
  • May 22, 2019: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • May 21, 2019: [Certificate of Good Standing]
  • May 20, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 20, 2019: [Redacted Document]
  • May 20, 2019: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.