U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Delaware

delaware Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Delaware
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:19-cr-00071-1
  • Case Name: USA v. VillaGomez-Herrera
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
July, 2019
  • July 22, 2019: [Judgment]
  • July 17, 2019: [Order on Motion for Downward Departure]
  • July 17, 2019: [Downward Departure]
  • July 17, 2019: [Sealed Document]
  • July 17, 2019: [Plea Agreement Filed]
  • July 17, 2019: [Plea and Sentence]
  • July 17, 2019: [Waiver of Indictment]
May, 2019
  • May 28, 2019: [~Util - Interpreter Requested]
  • May 28, 2019: [Order Scheduling Guilty Plea - Rule 11]
  • May 22, 2019: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • May 21, 2019: [Information - Felony]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.