U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Delaware

delaware Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Delaware
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:19-cr-00070-2
  • Case Name: USA v. Elgart
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2019
  • October 22, 2019: [Judgment]
  • October 18, 2019: [Sentencing]
  • October 10, 2019: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • October 08, 2019: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • October 04, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • October 04, 2019: [Order]
  • October 04, 2019: [- CORRECTING ENTRY]
  • October 04, 2019: [Exhibit to a Document]
  • October 03, 2019: [Continue]
July, 2019
  • July 02, 2019: [Order Scheduling Sentencing]
  • July 02, 2019: [Exhibit to a Document]
  • July 02, 2019: [Plea Agreement Filed]
  • July 02, 2019: [Plea Hearing - Plea Accepted]
  • July 02, 2019: [Waiver of Indictment]
May, 2019
  • May 30, 2019: [Order Scheduling Guilty Plea - Rule 11]
  • May 22, 2019: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • May 21, 2019: [Information - Felony]
  • May 21, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Indict]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.