U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Delaware

delaware Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Delaware
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:18-cr-00099-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Osborne
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
June, 2019
  • June 07, 2019: [Judgment]
  • June 06, 2019: [Sentencing]
May, 2019
  • May 30, 2019: [Sealed Document]
  • May 28, 2019: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • May 23, 2019: [Order]
  • May 22, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • May 22, 2019: [Protective Order]
  • May 21, 2019: [Extension of Time to File Document]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.