U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Delaware

delaware Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Delaware
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:11-cr-00086-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Skinner
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
July, 2021
  • July 01, 2021: [Judgment - Amended]
June, 2021
  • June 30, 2021: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • June 29, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • June 23, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Substitution of Counsel]
  • June 18, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • June 17, 2021: [Order of Detention - Temporary Detention]
  • June 17, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 17, 2021: [Detain Pending Trial]
  • June 17, 2021: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • June 17, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • June 17, 2021: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • June 17, 2021: [Arrest - Prob/Superv. Release Violation Only]
December, 2019
  • December 03, 2019: [Letter]
May, 2019
  • May 31, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • May 30, 2019: [SO ORDERED - Probation Petition only]
  • May 30, 2019: [Probation Petition re Revocation of Supervised Release]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.