U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Delaware

delaware Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Delaware
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:19-cr-00075-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Clark
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2021
  • March 25, 2021: [Judgment - Amended]
  • March 24, 2021: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • March 24, 2021: [Amend/Correct]
  • March 18, 2021: [Judgment]
  • March 18, 2021: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • March 17, 2021: [Sentencing]
  • March 17, 2021: [Dismiss]
  • March 16, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • March 16, 2021: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • March 16, 2021: [Letter]
  • March 09, 2021: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • March 03, 2021: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
February, 2021
  • February 09, 2021: [Order]
  • February 09, 2021: [Letter]
January, 2021
  • January 04, 2021: [Order]
  • January 04, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
December, 2020
  • December 23, 2020: [Continue]
October, 2020
  • October 14, 2020: [Order Scheduling Sentencing]
  • October 14, 2020: [- CORRECTING ENTRY]
  • October 14, 2020: [Plea Agreement Filed]
  • October 14, 2020: [Exhibit to a Document]
  • October 14, 2020: [Change of Plea Hearing]
August, 2020
  • August 11, 2020: [Order Scheduling Guilty Plea - Rule 11]
May, 2020
  • May 21, 2020: [Order Scheduling Guilty Plea - Rule 11]
  • May 20, 2020: [Status Report ]
April, 2020
  • April 23, 2020: [Order]
  • April 23, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 23, 2020: [Status Report ]
  • April 17, 2020: [Oral Order]
March, 2020
  • March 23, 2020: [Order Scheduling Guilty Plea - Rule 11]
  • March 20, 2020: [Order]
  • March 20, 2020: [Exclude]
  • March 17, 2020: [Telephone Conference]
January, 2020
  • January 28, 2020: [Order]
  • January 28, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • January 28, 2020: [Continue]
  • January 13, 2020: [Order]
  • January 13, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • January 13, 2020: [Hearing]
November, 2019
  • November 13, 2019: [Order]
  • November 13, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • November 13, 2019: [Extension of Time to File Document]
September, 2019
  • September 13, 2019: [Order]
  • September 13, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • September 12, 2019: [Extension of Time to File Document]
July, 2019
  • July 08, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • July 08, 2019: [Extension of Time to File Document]
June, 2019
  • June 11, 2019: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • June 10, 2019: [Protective Order]
  • June 07, 2019: [Order to Continue - Pretrial Motion Filing]
  • June 07, 2019: [Arraignment - Not Guilty Plea]
  • June 05, 2019: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • June 04, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
May, 2019
  • May 31, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • May 31, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 31, 2019: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • May 31, 2019: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • May 31, 2019: [Case Unsealed]
  • May 31, 2019: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
  • May 31, 2019: [Unseal Case]
  • May 31, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • May 31, 2019: [Indictment Unsealed]
  • May 31, 2019: [Arrest ]
  • May 31, 2019: [Order on Motion for Warrant]
  • May 31, 2019: [Warrant ]
  • May 31, 2019: [Redacted Document]
  • May 31, 2019: [Indictment - Sealed]
  • May 31, 2019: [Order on Motion to Seal Case]
  • May 31, 2019: [Seal Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.