U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Delaware

delaware Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Delaware
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:19-cr-00073-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Sesay
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2020
  • October 23, 2020: [Sentencing]
  • October 22, 2020: [Letter]
  • October 21, 2020: [Letter]
  • October 15, 2020: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • October 13, 2020: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • October 09, 2020: [Status Report ]
September, 2020
  • September 04, 2020: [Declaration]
August, 2020
  • August 26, 2020: [Order Scheduling Sentencing]
  • August 26, 2020: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • August 24, 2020: [Status Report ]
July, 2020
  • July 20, 2020: [Order Scheduling Sentencing]
  • July 20, 2020: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • July 14, 2020: [Status Report ]
  • July 13, 2020: [Order]
  • July 13, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • July 08, 2020: [Order]
  • July 08, 2020: [Forfeiture - Preliminary Order]
June, 2020
  • June 17, 2020: [Order Scheduling Sentencing]
  • June 15, 2020: [Status Report ]
May, 2020
  • May 20, 2020: [Status Report ]
April, 2020
  • April 28, 2020: [Order]
  • April 28, 2020: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • April 28, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • April 23, 2020: [Status Report ]
March, 2020
  • March 24, 2020: [Order Scheduling Sentencing]
  • March 24, 2020: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • March 23, 2020: [Status Report ]
  • March 19, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
February, 2020
  • February 26, 2020: [Order Scheduling Sentencing]
December, 2019
  • December 23, 2019: [Order Scheduling Sentencing]
  • December 19, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • December 19, 2019: [Plea Agreement Filed]
  • December 19, 2019: [Sealed Document]
  • December 09, 2019: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
November, 2019
  • November 13, 2019: [Order]
  • November 13, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 13, 2019: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • November 12, 2019: [Telephone Conference]
October, 2019
  • October 02, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Substitution of Counsel]
September, 2019
  • September 09, 2019: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • September 09, 2019: [Order]
  • September 09, 2019: [Order to Continue - Pretrial Motion Filing]
  • September 09, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 03, 2019: [Extension of Time to File Document]
July, 2019
  • July 08, 2019: [Oral Order]
  • July 08, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 08, 2019: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • July 08, 2019: [Order]
  • July 08, 2019: [Order to Continue - Pretrial Motion Filing]
  • July 03, 2019: [Extension of Time to File Document]
June, 2019
  • June 11, 2019: [Order]
  • June 07, 2019: [Order to Continue - Pretrial Motion Filing]
  • June 07, 2019: [Arraignment - Not Guilty Plea]
  • June 05, 2019: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • June 03, 2019: [Protective Order]
May, 2019
  • May 31, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 31, 2019: [Redacted Document]
  • May 31, 2019: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.