U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Delaware

delaware Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Delaware
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:19-cr-00074-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Harber
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
September, 2022
  • September 09, 2022: [Letter]
August, 2022
  • August 29, 2022: [Mail Returned]
  • August 09, 2022: [Mail Returned]
July, 2022
  • July 21, 2022: [Letter]
  • July 20, 2022: [Letter]
December, 2021
  • December 08, 2021: [Letter]
November, 2020
  • November 06, 2020: [Judgment]
  • November 05, 2020: [Sentencing]
  • November 04, 2020: [Letter]
October, 2020
  • October 23, 2020: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
September, 2020
  • September 18, 2020: [Letter]
  • September 18, 2020: [Order]
  • September 18, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 17, 2020: [Continue]
May, 2020
  • May 29, 2020: [Order]
  • May 29, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 20, 2020: [Status Report ]
April, 2020
  • April 07, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
January, 2020
  • January 07, 2020: [Order Scheduling Sentencing]
  • January 07, 2020: [Exhibit to a Document]
  • January 07, 2020: [Plea Agreement Filed]
  • January 06, 2020: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • January 06, 2020: [Remark]
December, 2019
  • December 05, 2019: [Mail Returned]
November, 2019
  • November 20, 2019: [Status Conference - Deft. present]
  • November 18, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 18, 2019: [Order]
  • November 18, 2019: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • November 15, 2019: [Letter]
  • November 14, 2019: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • November 14, 2019: [Order]
  • November 14, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 13, 2019: [Continue]
September, 2019
  • September 13, 2019: [Order]
  • September 13, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
August, 2019
  • August 20, 2019: [- CORRECTING ENTRY]
  • August 14, 2019: [Order]
  • August 14, 2019: [Protective Order]
July, 2019
  • July 09, 2019: [Order]
  • July 09, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • July 09, 2019: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • July 08, 2019: [Extension of Time to File Document]
June, 2019
  • June 24, 2019: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • June 24, 2019: [Protective Order]
  • June 19, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • June 14, 2019: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • June 10, 2019: [Protective Order]
  • June 06, 2019: [Exhibit List ]
  • June 06, 2019: [Order to Continue - Pretrial Motion Filing]
  • June 06, 2019: [Arraignment - Not Guilty Plea]
  • June 06, 2019: [Oral Order]
  • June 06, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • June 05, 2019: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
May, 2019
  • May 31, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 31, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • May 31, 2019: [Order of Detention - Temporary Detention]
  • May 31, 2019: [Detain Pending Trial]
  • May 31, 2019: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • May 31, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • May 31, 2019: [Arrest ]
  • May 31, 2019: [Order on Motion for Warrant]
  • May 31, 2019: [Warrant ]
  • May 31, 2019: [Redacted Document]
  • May 31, 2019: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.