U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Delaware

delaware Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Delaware
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:19-cr-00077-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Helm
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2022
  • March 02, 2022: [Order - Memorandum and Order]
  • March 02, 2022: [Opinion - Memorandum Opinion]
January, 2022
  • January 19, 2022: [Order on Motion to Seal]
  • January 12, 2022: [Seal]
  • January 11, 2022: [Response to Motion]
November, 2021
  • November 18, 2021: [Reduce Sentence - USSC Amendment - 18:3582c2]
October, 2020
  • October 13, 2020: [Judgment]
  • October 13, 2020: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • October 05, 2020: [Dismiss]
  • October 02, 2020: [Sentencing]
September, 2020
  • September 03, 2020: [Order Scheduling Sentencing]
  • September 01, 2020: [Order]
  • September 01, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
August, 2020
  • August 24, 2020: [Order Scheduling Sentencing]
June, 2020
  • June 12, 2020: [Order Scheduling Sentencing]
  • June 10, 2020: [Order]
  • June 10, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
March, 2020
  • March 16, 2020: [Order Scheduling Sentencing]
  • March 16, 2020: [Order]
  • March 13, 2020: [Continue]
  • March 11, 2020: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • March 06, 2020: [Order Scheduling Sentencing]
  • March 06, 2020: [Order]
  • March 04, 2020: [Extension of Time to File Document]
  • March 04, 2020: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
February, 2020
  • February 24, 2020: [Declaration]
January, 2020
  • January 10, 2020: [Order on Motion for Preliminary Order of Forfeiture]
  • January 09, 2020: [Forfeiture - Preliminary Order]
November, 2019
  • November 25, 2019: [Order Scheduling Sentencing]
  • November 25, 2019: [Plea Agreement Filed]
  • November 25, 2019: [Sealed Document]
  • November 25, 2019: [Arraignment - Guilty Plea]
  • November 25, 2019: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • November 25, 2019: [Information - Felony]
  • November 14, 2019: [Letter]
  • November 14, 2019: [Order Scheduling Guilty Plea - Rule 11]
  • November 13, 2019: [Remark]
  • November 13, 2019: [Letter]
October, 2019
  • October 17, 2019: [Order Scheduling Guilty Plea - Rule 11]
September, 2019
  • September 20, 2019: [Order]
  • September 20, 2019: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • September 20, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • September 20, 2019: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • September 18, 2019: [Speedy Trial - Waive Speedy Trial]
  • September 11, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • September 10, 2019: [Oral Order]
  • September 10, 2019: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • September 06, 2019: [Letter]
August, 2019
  • August 02, 2019: [Order to Continue - Pretrial Motion Filing]
July, 2019
  • July 24, 2019: [Redacted Document]
  • July 23, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • July 22, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • July 22, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 22, 2019: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • July 22, 2019: [Telephone Conference]
  • July 18, 2019: [Order]
  • July 18, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 09, 2019: [Stipulation]
  • July 02, 2019: [Order of Detention]
June, 2019
  • June 21, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • June 17, 2019: [Writ Returned Executed]
  • June 17, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • June 14, 2019: [Order to Continue - Pretrial Motion Filing]
  • June 14, 2019: [Arraignment - Not Guilty Plea]
  • June 14, 2019: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • June 14, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • June 12, 2019: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • June 07, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 07, 2019: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued]
  • June 05, 2019: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • June 05, 2019: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • June 05, 2019: [Order on Motion for Warrant]
  • June 05, 2019: [Warrant ]
  • June 05, 2019: [Redacted Document]
  • June 05, 2019: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.