U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Delaware

delaware Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Delaware
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:19-cr-00078-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Sandoval-Luis
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2020
  • December 01, 2020: [Oral Order]
  • December 01, 2020: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys]
November, 2020
  • November 30, 2020: [Withdraw as Attorney]
January, 2020
  • January 09, 2020: [Judgment]
  • January 03, 2020: [Sentencing]
December, 2019
  • December 26, 2019: [Exhibit to a Document]
  • December 20, 2019: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • December 16, 2019: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
November, 2019
  • November 18, 2019: [~Util - Interpreter Requested]
  • November 18, 2019: [Order Scheduling Sentencing]
  • November 15, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • November 15, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 15, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Substitution of Counsel]
September, 2019
  • September 16, 2019: [Order]
  • September 16, 2019: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • September 16, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 16, 2019: [~Util - Interpreter Requested]
July, 2019
  • July 12, 2019: [Order]
  • July 12, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • July 12, 2019: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • July 12, 2019: [1 - Terminate Deadlines]
  • July 12, 2019: [Extension of Time to File Document]
June, 2019
  • June 14, 2019: [Order to Continue - Pretrial Motion Filing]
  • June 14, 2019: [Arraignment - Not Guilty Plea]
  • June 12, 2019: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • June 05, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 05, 2019: [Redacted Document]
  • June 05, 2019: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.