U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Delaware

delaware Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Delaware
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:19-cr-00076-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Tum-Tojin
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2020
  • March 09, 2020: [Judgment]
  • March 06, 2020: [Sentencing]
  • March 02, 2020: [Exhibit to a Document]
February, 2020
  • February 28, 2020: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • February 05, 2020: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
November, 2019
  • November 26, 2019: [Order Scheduling Sentencing]
  • November 26, 2019: [~Util - Interpreter Requested]
  • November 26, 2019: [Exhibit to a Document]
  • November 26, 2019: [Plea Agreement Filed]
  • November 26, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • November 15, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Substitution of Counsel]
September, 2019
  • September 17, 2019: [Order]
  • September 17, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 17, 2019: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • September 17, 2019: [~Util - Interpreter Requested]
July, 2019
  • July 26, 2019: [Order to Continue - Pretrial Motion Filing]
  • July 24, 2019: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • July 03, 2019: [Extension of Time to File Document]
June, 2019
  • June 21, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • June 07, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • June 07, 2019: [Order to Continue - Pretrial Motion Filing]
  • June 07, 2019: [Arraignment - Not Guilty Plea]
  • June 07, 2019: [Oral Order]
  • June 07, 2019: [Detain Pending Trial]
  • June 07, 2019: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • June 07, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • June 05, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 05, 2019: [Order on Motion for Warrant]
  • June 05, 2019: [Warrant ]
  • June 05, 2019: [Redacted Document]
  • June 05, 2019: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.