U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Delaware

delaware Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Delaware
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:19-cr-00069-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Phipps
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 17, 2023: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • January 12, 2023: [Brady Order]
  • January 12, 2023: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • January 12, 2023: [Detain Pending Trial]
  • January 12, 2023: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • January 12, 2023: [Arrest - Prob/Superv. Release Violation Only]
  • January 12, 2023: [Probation Petition re Revocation of Supervised Release]
November, 2020
  • November 05, 2020: [Judgment]
  • November 04, 2020: [Sentencing]
October, 2020
  • October 23, 2020: [Order]
  • October 23, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 22, 2020: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • October 19, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • October 19, 2020: [Extension of Time to File Document]
  • October 16, 2020: [Letter]
  • October 06, 2020: [Status Conference - Deft. present]
September, 2020
  • September 08, 2020: [Order]
  • September 08, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
August, 2020
  • August 24, 2020: [Order]
  • August 24, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 14, 2020: [Exhibit to a Document]
  • August 13, 2020: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
July, 2020
  • July 23, 2020: [Status Report ]
June, 2020
  • June 12, 2020: [Order]
  • June 12, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
May, 2020
  • May 18, 2020: [Order]
  • May 18, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 13, 2020: [Status Report ]
January, 2020
  • January 24, 2020: [Order Scheduling Sentencing]
  • January 23, 2020: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • January 07, 2020: [Order]
  • January 07, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 07, 2020: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
December, 2019
  • December 10, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
November, 2019
  • November 27, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 27, 2019: [Oral Order]
  • November 27, 2019: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • November 27, 2019: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • November 26, 2019: [Status Report ]
  • November 01, 2019: [Order]
  • November 01, 2019: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • November 01, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
October, 2019
  • October 31, 2019: [Telephone Conference]
  • October 16, 2019: [Order]
  • October 16, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 16, 2019: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • October 16, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • October 15, 2019: [Hearing]
August, 2019
  • August 13, 2019: [Order]
  • August 13, 2019: [Order to Continue - Pretrial Motion Filing]
  • August 13, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 12, 2019: [Extension of Time to File Document]
  • August 07, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • August 06, 2019: [Order]
  • August 06, 2019: [Protective Order]
July, 2019
  • July 12, 2019: [Order to Continue - Pretrial Motion Filing]
  • July 12, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • July 12, 2019: [Arraignment - Not Guilty Plea]
  • July 05, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 05, 2019: [Rule 5c3 Documents Received - formerly Rule 40]
  • July 05, 2019: [Pleadings from Other District - Rule 5c3 - formerly rule 40]
June, 2019
  • June 19, 2019: [CJA 20 - Oral Appointment]
  • June 19, 2019: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • June 18, 2019: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
  • June 18, 2019: [Unseal Case]
  • June 18, 2019: [Indictment Unsealed]
  • June 18, 2019: [Case Unsealed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.