U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Delaware

delaware Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Delaware
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:19-cr-00082-1
  • Case Name: USA v. French
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
February, 2021
  • February 26, 2021: [Order on Motion to Reduce Sentence- USSC Amendment -18:3582c2]
January, 2021
  • January 11, 2021: [Exhibit to a Document]
  • January 11, 2021: [Response to Motion]
December, 2020
  • December 21, 2020: [Order Setting Response Deadline]
  • December 03, 2020: [Reduce Sentence - USSC Amendment - 18:3582c2]
November, 2020
  • November 02, 2020: [Letter]
August, 2020
  • August 14, 2020: [Judgment - Amended]
July, 2020
  • July 29, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Substitution of Counsel]
  • July 29, 2020: [Order]
  • July 29, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 17, 2020: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • July 16, 2020: [Telephone Conference]
  • July 10, 2020: [Remark]
  • July 10, 2020: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • July 10, 2020: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • July 10, 2020: [Order]
  • July 10, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 09, 2020: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • July 09, 2020: [Oral Order]
  • July 09, 2020: [Detain Pending Trial]
  • July 09, 2020: [Detention Hearing]
  • July 09, 2020: [Probation Petition re Revocation of Supervised Release]
February, 2020
  • February 04, 2020: [Modify Conditions of Release]
  • February 04, 2020: [Exhibit List ]
  • February 04, 2020: [Evidentiary Hearing]
January, 2020
  • January 24, 2020: [Order]
  • January 24, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 23, 2020: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • January 16, 2020: [Probation Petition re Revocation of Supervised Release]
August, 2019
  • August 01, 2019: [Order]
  • August 01, 2019: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
July, 2019
  • July 29, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • July 26, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • July 26, 2019: [Order]
  • July 25, 2019: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • July 25, 2019: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • July 25, 2019: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • July 15, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Substitution of Counsel]
  • July 15, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 15, 2019: [SO ORDERED - Probation Petition only]
  • July 15, 2019: [Probation Petition re Revocation of Supervised Release]
  • July 15, 2019: [Pleadings from Other District - Rule 5c3 - formerly rule 40]
  • July 01, 2019: [Order]
June, 2019
  • June 26, 2019: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • June 19, 2019: [Pleadings from Other District - Rule 5c3 - formerly rule 40]
  • June 19, 2019: [Transfer In/Supervised Release]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.