U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Delaware

delaware Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Delaware
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:19-cr-00083-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Wise
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2025
  • March 13, 2025: [USCA Order Terminating Appeal]
October, 2024
  • October 21, 2024: [Set/Reset Hearings]
February, 2020
  • February 12, 2020: [Judgment]
  • February 05, 2020: [Sentencing]
January, 2020
  • January 27, 2020: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • January 23, 2020: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Document]
  • January 23, 2020: [Leave to File Document]
  • January 22, 2020: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • January 22, 2020: [Downward Departure]
  • January 10, 2020: [Order]
  • January 10, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • January 10, 2020: [Continue]
  • January 09, 2020: [- CORRECTING ENTRY]
October, 2019
  • October 16, 2019: [Order Scheduling Sentencing]
  • October 16, 2019: [Exhibit to a Document]
  • October 16, 2019: [Plea Agreement Filed]
  • October 16, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
September, 2019
  • September 19, 2019: [Order Scheduling Guilty Plea - Rule 11]
August, 2019
  • August 06, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • August 06, 2019: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • August 02, 2019: [Extension of Time to File Document]
July, 2019
  • July 31, 2019: [Redacted Document]
  • July 05, 2019: [Order to Continue - Pretrial Motion Filing]
  • July 05, 2019: [Arraignment - Not Guilty Plea]
  • July 03, 2019: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
June, 2019
  • June 26, 2019: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • June 26, 2019: [Redacted Document]
  • June 26, 2019: [Indictment]
  • June 26, 2019: [Case Unsealed]
  • June 26, 2019: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
  • June 26, 2019: [Unseal Case]
  • June 26, 2019: [Criminal Complaint Unsealed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.