U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Delaware

delaware Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Delaware
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:19-cr-00087-2
  • Case Name: USA v. Roseboro
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
June, 2021
  • June 24, 2021: [Order]
  • June 24, 2021: [Dismiss]
  • June 24, 2021: [Judgment]
  • June 15, 2021: [Sentencing]
  • June 09, 2021: [Letter]
  • June 08, 2021: [Letter]
  • June 07, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
May, 2021
  • May 11, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 11, 2021: [Order]
  • May 11, 2021: [Continue]
  • May 11, 2021: [Forfeiture - Preliminary Order]
February, 2021
  • February 04, 2021: [Order Scheduling Sentencing]
  • February 03, 2021: [Sealed Document]
  • February 03, 2021: [Plea Agreement Filed]
  • February 03, 2021: [Plea Hearing - Plea Accepted]
  • February 03, 2021: [Information - Felony]
January, 2021
  • January 27, 2021: [Waiver of Indictment]
December, 2020
  • December 22, 2020: [Order Scheduling Guilty Plea - Rule 11]
  • December 18, 2020: [Order]
  • December 18, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
November, 2020
  • November 20, 2020: [Order]
  • November 20, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
October, 2020
  • October 20, 2020: [Order]
  • October 20, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
September, 2020
  • September 21, 2020: [Order]
  • September 21, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
August, 2020
  • August 21, 2020: [Order]
  • August 21, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
June, 2020
  • June 22, 2020: [Order]
  • June 22, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 22, 2020: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
May, 2020
  • May 08, 2020: [Order]
  • May 08, 2020: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • May 08, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
March, 2020
  • March 19, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 19, 2020: [Order]
  • March 19, 2020: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • March 19, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 19, 2020: [Telephone Conference]
February, 2020
  • February 20, 2020: [Order]
  • February 05, 2020: [Order]
  • February 04, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
December, 2019
  • December 20, 2019: [Order]
  • December 20, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 20, 2019: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • December 19, 2019: [Exclude]
October, 2019
  • October 21, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • October 21, 2019: [Order]
  • October 21, 2019: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • October 21, 2019: [Extension of Time to File Document]
August, 2019
  • August 21, 2019: [Order]
  • August 21, 2019: [Order to Continue - Pretrial Motion Filing]
  • August 21, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • August 19, 2019: [Extension of Time to File Document]
July, 2019
  • July 22, 2019: [Order to Continue - Pretrial Motion Filing]
  • July 22, 2019: [Arraignment - Not Guilty Plea]
  • July 15, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • July 12, 2019: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • July 12, 2019: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • July 12, 2019: [Detain Pending Trial]
  • July 12, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • July 10, 2019: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • July 10, 2019: [Rule 5c3 Documents Received - formerly Rule 40]
  • July 10, 2019: [Arrest - Other District ]
  • July 10, 2019: [Oral Order]
  • July 10, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • July 05, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 03, 2019: [Redacted Document]
  • July 03, 2019: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.