U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Delaware

delaware Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Delaware
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:19-cr-00088-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Brown
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
September, 2022
  • September 19, 2022: [Order on Motion for Early Termination of Probation]
  • September 08, 2022: [Early Termination of Probation]
September, 2020
  • September 15, 2020: [Order]
  • September 15, 2020: [Status Report ]
  • September 09, 2020: [Reduce Sentence]
May, 2020
  • May 28, 2020: [Exhibit to a Document]
February, 2020
  • February 12, 2020: [Judgment]
January, 2020
  • January 30, 2020: [Sentencing]
  • January 29, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • January 24, 2020: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • January 17, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • January 15, 2020: [Extension of Time to File Document]
November, 2019
  • November 14, 2019: [Order Scheduling Sentencing]
  • November 14, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • November 14, 2019: [Continue]
October, 2019
  • October 09, 2019: [Order Scheduling Sentencing]
August, 2019
  • August 15, 2019: [Order Scheduling Sentencing]
  • August 06, 2019: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • August 06, 2019: [Sealed Document]
  • August 06, 2019: [Plea Agreement Filed]
  • August 06, 2019: [Redacted Document]
  • August 06, 2019: [Plea Hearing - Plea Accepted]
  • August 06, 2019: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • August 05, 2019: [Summons Returned Executed]
July, 2019
  • July 26, 2019: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • July 26, 2019: [Oral Order]
  • July 26, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 17, 2019: [Order]
  • July 17, 2019: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • July 17, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 17, 2019: [Amend/Correct]
  • July 15, 2019: [Order]
  • July 15, 2019: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • July 15, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 15, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • July 10, 2019: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • July 05, 2019: [Information - Felony]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.