U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Delaware

delaware Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Delaware
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:19-cr-00091-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Campusano Perez
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
September, 2019
  • September 20, 2019: [Judgment]
  • September 18, 2019: [Remark]
  • September 18, 2019: [Order on Motion for Downward Departure]
  • September 18, 2019: [Downward Departure]
  • September 18, 2019: [Exhibit to a Document]
  • September 18, 2019: [Plea Agreement Filed]
  • September 18, 2019: [Plea and Sentence]
  • September 18, 2019: [Waiver of Indictment]
July, 2019
  • July 18, 2019: [Order Scheduling Guilty Plea - Rule 11]
  • July 18, 2019: [~Util - Interpreter Requested]
  • July 18, 2019: [Order Scheduling Sentencing]
  • July 18, 2019: [- CORRECTING ENTRY]
  • July 17, 2019: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • July 17, 2019: [Continue]
  • July 17, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • July 12, 2019: [Information - Felony]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.