U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Delaware

delaware Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Delaware
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:19-cr-00090-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Punter
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2024
  • October 10, 2024: [Order]
June, 2021
  • June 10, 2021: [Judgment]
  • June 03, 2021: [Sentencing]
May, 2021
  • May 26, 2021: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • May 21, 2021: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • May 13, 2021: [Order Scheduling Sentencing]
February, 2021
  • February 22, 2021: [Order Scheduling Sentencing]
  • February 17, 2021: [Sealed Document]
  • February 17, 2021: [Plea Agreement Filed]
  • February 17, 2021: [Arraignment - Guilty Plea]
  • February 17, 2021: [Information - Felony]
  • February 17, 2021: [Waiver of Indictment]
January, 2021
  • January 07, 2021: [Order]
  • January 07, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • January 07, 2021: [Order Scheduling Guilty Plea - Rule 11]
  • January 06, 2021: [Continue]
December, 2020
  • December 29, 2020: [Order]
  • December 29, 2020: [Opinion - Memorandum Opinion]
  • December 17, 2020: [Response to Motion]
  • December 15, 2020: [Order Scheduling Guilty Plea - Rule 11]
  • December 10, 2020: [Order Setting Response Deadline]
  • December 10, 2020: [Sealed Motion]
November, 2020
  • November 25, 2020: [Order Scheduling Guilty Plea - Rule 11]
  • November 25, 2020: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
October, 2020
  • October 01, 2020: [Order Scheduling Guilty Plea - Rule 11]
  • October 01, 2020: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
September, 2020
  • September 30, 2020: [Status Report ]
  • September 02, 2020: [Order]
  • September 02, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • September 02, 2020: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • September 01, 2020: [Status Report ]
August, 2020
  • August 14, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • August 14, 2020: [Order]
  • August 14, 2020: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
July, 2020
  • July 31, 2020: [Status Report ]
  • July 01, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • July 01, 2020: [Order]
  • July 01, 2020: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • July 01, 2020: [Status Report ]
June, 2020
  • June 05, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • June 05, 2020: [Order]
  • June 05, 2020: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • June 01, 2020: [Status Report ]
May, 2020
  • May 05, 2020: [Order]
  • May 05, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • May 05, 2020: [Opinion - Memorandum Opinion]
  • May 05, 2020: [Miscellaneous Hearing]
  • May 04, 2020: [Order]
  • May 04, 2020: [Exhibit to a Document]
  • May 04, 2020: [Seal Document]
April, 2020
  • April 27, 2020: [Status Report ]
  • April 23, 2020: [Response to Motion]
  • April 20, 2020: [Order Setting Response Deadline]
  • April 20, 2020: [Release from Custody]
  • April 15, 2020: [Status Report ]
March, 2020
  • March 16, 2020: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • March 16, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • March 03, 2020: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • March 03, 2020: [Order]
  • March 03, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 03, 2020: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
January, 2020
  • January 09, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 09, 2020: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • January 09, 2020: [Order]
  • January 09, 2020: [Order to Continue - Pretrial Motion Filing]
  • January 06, 2020: [Extension of Time to File Document]
November, 2019
  • November 14, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • November 14, 2019: [Order]
  • November 14, 2019: [Order to Continue - Pretrial Motion Filing]
  • November 14, 2019: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • November 12, 2019: [Extension of Time to File Document]
October, 2019
  • October 09, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Substitution of Counsel]
  • October 08, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 08, 2019: [Order]
  • October 08, 2019: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • October 02, 2019: [Telephone Conference]
September, 2019
  • September 12, 2019: [Order]
  • September 12, 2019: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • September 12, 2019: [Order to Continue - Pretrial Motion Filing]
  • September 11, 2019: [Extension of Time to File Document]
August, 2019
  • August 15, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 15, 2019: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • August 15, 2019: [Order]
  • August 15, 2019: [Order to Continue - Pretrial Motion Filing]
  • August 15, 2019: [Extension of Time to File Document]
July, 2019
  • July 29, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • July 23, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • July 23, 2019: [Oral Order]
  • July 23, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • July 17, 2019: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • July 17, 2019: [Order to Continue - Pretrial Motion Filing]
  • July 17, 2019: [Arraignment - Not Guilty Plea]
  • July 17, 2019: [Order of Detention - Temporary Detention]
  • July 17, 2019: [Detain Pending Trial]
  • July 17, 2019: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • July 17, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • July 16, 2019: [Order]
  • July 16, 2019: [Unseal Case]
  • July 16, 2019: [Case Unsealed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.