U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Delaware

delaware Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Delaware
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:19-cr-00092-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Wright
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 11, 2022: [USCA Mandate]
April, 2021
  • April 28, 2021: [--Transcript]
March, 2021
  • March 02, 2021: [- - Notice of Docketing ROA - 3rd Circuit]
  • March 01, 2021: [- NOTICE OF APPEAL- Final Judgment]
February, 2021
  • February 22, 2021: [Judgment]
  • February 11, 2021: [Sentencing]
November, 2020
  • November 23, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
October, 2020
  • October 02, 2020: [Order]
  • October 02, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 02, 2020: [Continue]
August, 2020
  • August 17, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
May, 2020
  • May 12, 2020: [Order]
  • May 12, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • May 12, 2020: [Continue]
April, 2020
  • April 23, 2020: [Order]
  • April 23, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 23, 2020: [Status Report ]
March, 2020
  • March 20, 2020: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
February, 2020
  • February 24, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
January, 2020
  • January 23, 2020: [Oral Order]
  • January 23, 2020: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • January 17, 2020: [Exhibit to a Document]
  • January 16, 2020: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • January 06, 2020: [Order]
  • January 06, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 03, 2020: [Continue]
December, 2019
  • December 27, 2019: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
November, 2019
  • November 12, 2019: [Order]
  • November 12, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • November 11, 2019: [Continue]
August, 2019
  • August 08, 2019: [Order Scheduling Sentencing]
  • August 08, 2019: [Exhibit to a Document]
  • August 08, 2019: [Plea Agreement Filed]
  • August 08, 2019: [Plea Hearing - Plea Accepted]
  • August 08, 2019: [Waiver of Indictment]
July, 2019
  • July 25, 2019: [Order Scheduling Guilty Plea - Rule 11]
  • July 24, 2019: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • July 23, 2019: [Information - Felony]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.