U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Delaware

delaware Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Delaware
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:19-cr-00093-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Colon-Sierra
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2021
  • November 02, 2021: [Remark]
June, 2021
  • June 23, 2021: [Letter]
July, 2020
  • July 22, 2020: [Judgment Returned Executed]
February, 2020
  • February 26, 2020: [--Transcript - Redacted]
  • February 21, 2020: [Order on Motion to Redact Transcript]
  • February 20, 2020: [Redact Transcript]
  • February 14, 2020: [--Transcript (SEALED)]
  • February 14, 2020: [--Transcript]
January, 2020
  • January 15, 2020: [Judgment]
  • January 13, 2020: [Exhibit List ]
  • January 08, 2020: [Sentencing]
  • January 06, 2020: [Order Scheduling Sentencing]
  • January 06, 2020: [~Util - Interpreter Requested]
  • January 06, 2020: [Oral Order]
  • January 06, 2020: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • January 03, 2020: [- CORRECTING ENTRY]
  • January 02, 2020: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
December, 2019
  • December 26, 2019: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
November, 2019
  • November 25, 2019: [Order]
  • November 21, 2019: [Protective Order]
October, 2019
  • October 15, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
August, 2019
  • August 19, 2019: [Order Scheduling Sentencing]
  • August 19, 2019: [~Util - Interpreter Requested]
  • August 16, 2019: [Sealed Document]
  • August 16, 2019: [Plea Hearing - Plea Accepted]
  • August 16, 2019: [Plea Agreement Filed]
  • August 16, 2019: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • August 01, 2019: [Order Scheduling Guilty Plea - Rule 11]
  • August 01, 2019: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • August 01, 2019: [~Util - Interpreter Requested]
July, 2019
  • July 24, 2019: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • July 23, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Indict]
  • July 23, 2019: [Information - Felony]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.