U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Delaware

delaware Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Delaware
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:19-cr-00094-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Jacobs
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 13, 2023: [Acknowledgment of Receipt]
December, 2022
  • December 02, 2022: [Letter]
November, 2022
  • November 21, 2022: [Letter]
April, 2022
  • April 05, 2022: [Judgment - Amended]
March, 2022
  • March 23, 2022: [CJA 20 - Oral Appointment]
  • March 23, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • March 22, 2022: [Appoint Counsel]
  • March 22, 2022: [Letter]
  • March 08, 2022: [Order]
  • March 04, 2022: [USCA Mandate]
June, 2020
  • June 04, 2020: [Remark]
  • June 04, 2020: [Order on Motion to Unseal Document]
  • June 03, 2020: [Unseal Document]
April, 2020
  • April 17, 2020: [--Transcript (SEALED)]
  • April 16, 2020: [--Transcript]
February, 2020
  • February 18, 2020: [Order]
  • February 18, 2020: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • February 13, 2020: [Forfeiture - Final Order]
January, 2020
  • January 29, 2020: [- - Notice of Docketing ROA - 3rd Circuit]
  • January 28, 2020: [- NOTICE OF APPEAL- Final Judgment]
  • January 22, 2020: [Judgment]
  • January 13, 2020: [Sentencing]
  • January 09, 2020: [Letter]
  • January 09, 2020: [Order]
  • January 03, 2020: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • January 03, 2020: [Order - Memorandum and Order]
  • January 02, 2020: [Exhibit to a Document]
  • January 02, 2020: [Declaration]
December, 2019
  • December 27, 2019: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • December 06, 2019: [Response to Motion]
  • December 04, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
November, 2019
  • November 25, 2019: [--Transcript]
  • November 18, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 15, 2019: [--Transcript]
  • November 14, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • November 08, 2019: [Extension of Time to File Document]
October, 2019
  • October 15, 2019: [Order on Motion for Preliminary Order of Forfeiture]
  • October 10, 2019: [Forfeiture - Preliminary Order]
September, 2019
  • September 13, 2019: [Stipulation]
  • September 13, 2019: [Order Scheduling Sentencing]
  • September 12, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • September 12, 2019: [Order]
  • September 12, 2019: [Acknowledgment of Receipt]
  • September 12, 2019: [Exhibit List ]
  • September 12, 2019: [Redacted Document]
  • September 12, 2019: [Jury Verdict]
  • September 12, 2019: [Extension of Time to File Document]
  • September 12, 2019: [Plea Hearing - Plea Accepted]
  • September 12, 2019: [Jury Instructions ]
  • September 11, 2019: [Jury Trial Held]
  • September 10, 2019: [Verdict Sheet - Proposed]
  • September 10, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • September 10, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • September 10, 2019: [Jury Selection]
  • September 08, 2019: [Response to Motion]
  • September 08, 2019: [Dismiss]
  • September 04, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • September 03, 2019: [Response to Motion]
  • September 03, 2019: [Continue]
August, 2019
  • August 29, 2019: [Letter]
  • August 27, 2019: [Reply to the Response to Motion]
  • August 27, 2019: [Letter]
  • August 22, 2019: [Response to Motion]
  • August 22, 2019: [Pretrial Conference]
  • August 20, 2019: [Bill of Particulars]
  • August 20, 2019: [Continue]
  • August 19, 2019: [Exhibit to a Document]
  • August 19, 2019: [Letter]
  • August 19, 2019: [Voir Dire Questions]
  • August 19, 2019: [Reply to the Response to Motion]
  • August 16, 2019: [In Limine]
  • August 16, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • August 16, 2019: [Jury Instructions - Proposed]
  • August 16, 2019: [Voir Dire - Proposed]
  • August 16, 2019: [Verdict Sheet - Proposed]
  • August 16, 2019: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • August 16, 2019: [- CORRECTING ENTRY]
  • August 15, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • August 15, 2019: [Dismiss]
  • August 14, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 13, 2019: [Order]
  • August 12, 2019: [Protective Order]
  • August 07, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • August 05, 2019: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • August 02, 2019: [Order to Continue - Pretrial Motion Filing]
  • August 02, 2019: [Arraignment - Not Guilty Plea]
  • August 02, 2019: [Motion Hearing]
  • August 02, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
July, 2019
  • July 31, 2019: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • July 30, 2019: [Oral Order]
  • July 24, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 24, 2019: [Redacted Document]
  • July 24, 2019: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.