U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Delaware

delaware Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Delaware
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:19-cr-00084-1
  • Case Name: United States v. Bijansky
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2021
  • March 09, 2021: [Judgment]
  • March 03, 2021: [Sentencing]
February, 2021
  • February 24, 2021: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • February 23, 2021: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • February 23, 2021: [Declaration]
October, 2020
  • October 15, 2020: [Order]
  • October 15, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 14, 2020: [Continue]
  • October 01, 2020: [Order on Motion for Preliminary Order of Forfeiture]
September, 2020
  • September 29, 2020: [Forfeiture - Preliminary Order]
  • September 18, 2020: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • September 16, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
August, 2020
  • August 05, 2020: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • August 04, 2020: [Withdraw as Attorney]
July, 2020
  • July 16, 2020: [Order Scheduling Sentencing]
  • July 16, 2020: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • July 16, 2020: [Exhibit to a Document]
  • July 16, 2020: [Plea Agreement Filed]
  • July 16, 2020: [Plea Hearing - Plea Accepted]
  • July 16, 2020: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • July 16, 2020: [Information - Felony]
  • July 14, 2020: [Remark]
  • July 09, 2020: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • July 09, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
April, 2020
  • April 22, 2020: [Order]
  • April 22, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • April 22, 2020: [Continue]
January, 2020
  • January 23, 2020: [Order]
  • January 23, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • January 22, 2020: [Continue]
December, 2019
  • December 05, 2019: [CJA 20 - Oral Appointment]
November, 2019
  • November 22, 2019: [Order on Motion to Exclude]
  • November 21, 2019: [Exclude]
  • November 21, 2019: [Telephone Conference]
  • November 14, 2019: [Oral Order]
  • November 14, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
August, 2019
  • August 26, 2019: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • August 26, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • August 26, 2019: [- CORRECTING ENTRY]
  • August 23, 2019: [Extension of Time to File Document]
  • August 07, 2019: [Order of Detention]
July, 2019
  • July 29, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • July 25, 2019: [Order to Continue - Pretrial Motion Filing]
  • July 25, 2019: [Arraignment - Not Guilty Plea]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.