U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Delaware

delaware Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Delaware
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:19-cr-00097-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Garcia Ramirez
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2019
  • October 03, 2019: [Judgment]
September, 2019
  • September 26, 2019: [Order on Motion for Downward Departure]
  • September 26, 2019: [Downward Departure]
  • September 26, 2019: [Plea and Sentence]
  • September 26, 2019: [Sealed Document]
  • September 26, 2019: [Plea Agreement Filed]
  • September 26, 2019: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • September 25, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
August, 2019
  • August 06, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
July, 2019
  • July 31, 2019: [Interpreter Requested]
  • July 31, 2019: [Order Scheduling Guilty Plea - Rule 11]
  • July 31, 2019: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • July 31, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • July 31, 2019: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • July 29, 2019: [Extension of Time to Indict]
  • July 29, 2019: [Information - Felony]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.