U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Delaware

delaware Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Delaware
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:19-cr-00096-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Soliz
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2019
  • October 03, 2019: [Judgment]
  • October 03, 2019: [Order on Motion for Downward Departure]
  • October 01, 2019: [Downward Departure]
  • October 01, 2019: [Exhibit to a Document]
  • October 01, 2019: [Plea Agreement Filed]
  • October 01, 2019: [Plea and Sentence]
  • October 01, 2019: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • October 01, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • October 01, 2019: [Oral Order]
  • October 01, 2019: [~Util - Interpreter Requested]
August, 2019
  • August 01, 2019: [Order]
  • August 01, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 01, 2019: [~Util - Interpreter Requested]
July, 2019
  • July 31, 2019: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • July 29, 2019: [Extension of Time to Indict]
  • July 29, 2019: [Information - Felony]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.