U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Delaware

delaware Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Delaware
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:19-cr-00095-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Black
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2021
  • March 15, 2021: [Judgment]
  • March 10, 2021: [Sentencing]
  • March 03, 2021: [Order]
  • March 01, 2021: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • March 01, 2021: [Seal Document]
January, 2021
  • January 20, 2021: [Status Report ]
December, 2020
  • December 14, 2020: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
October, 2020
  • October 19, 2020: [Status Report ]
  • October 15, 2020: [Order Scheduling Sentencing]
  • October 05, 2020: [Status Report ]
August, 2020
  • August 26, 2020: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • August 24, 2020: [Status Report ]
July, 2020
  • July 20, 2020: [Order Scheduling Sentencing]
  • July 20, 2020: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • July 20, 2020: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • July 16, 2020: [Continue]
June, 2020
  • June 18, 2020: [Order Scheduling Sentencing]
  • June 18, 2020: [Status Report ]
May, 2020
  • May 20, 2020: [Status Report ]
  • May 18, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
April, 2020
  • April 17, 2020: [Order Scheduling Sentencing]
  • April 17, 2020: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • April 17, 2020: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • April 17, 2020: [Continue]
January, 2020
  • January 14, 2020: [Order Scheduling Sentencing]
  • January 14, 2020: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • January 14, 2020: [Continue]
September, 2019
  • September 03, 2019: [Order Scheduling Sentencing]
August, 2019
  • August 30, 2019: [Sealed Document]
  • August 30, 2019: [Plea Agreement Filed]
  • August 30, 2019: [Plea Hearing - Plea Accepted]
  • August 30, 2019: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • August 07, 2019: [Oral Order]
  • August 07, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 07, 2019: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
July, 2019
  • July 31, 2019: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • July 29, 2019: [Information - Felony]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.