U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Delaware

delaware Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Delaware
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:19-cr-00100-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Rodriguez Martinez
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2019
  • October 09, 2019: [Judgment]
  • October 08, 2019: [Order on Motion for Downward Departure]
  • October 08, 2019: [Downward Departure]
  • October 08, 2019: [Sealed Document]
  • October 08, 2019: [Plea Agreement Filed]
  • October 08, 2019: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • October 08, 2019: [Plea and Sentence]
September, 2019
  • September 23, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Substitution of Counsel]
August, 2019
  • August 20, 2019: [Order]
  • August 20, 2019: [~Util - Interpreter Requested]
  • August 20, 2019: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • August 20, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 07, 2019: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • August 06, 2019: [Speedy Trial - Waive Speedy Trial]
  • August 06, 2019: [Information - Felony]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.