U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Delaware

delaware Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Delaware
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:19-cr-00099-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Cifuentes Berduo
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
September, 2019
  • September 27, 2019: [Judgment]
  • September 19, 2019: [Order on Motion for Downward Departure]
  • September 19, 2019: [Downward Departure]
  • September 19, 2019: [Exhibit to a Document]
  • September 19, 2019: [Plea Agreement Filed]
  • September 19, 2019: [Plea and Sentence]
  • September 19, 2019: [Waiver of Indictment]
August, 2019
  • August 09, 2019: [Order]
  • August 09, 2019: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • August 09, 2019: [Order Scheduling Guilty Plea - Rule 11]
  • August 07, 2019: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • August 06, 2019: [Speedy Trial - Waive Speedy Trial]
  • August 06, 2019: [Information - Felony]
  • August 06, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Indict]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.