U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Delaware

delaware Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Delaware
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:19-cr-00102-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Gomez
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2019
  • October 03, 2019: [Judgment]
  • October 03, 2019: [Order on Motion for Downward Departure]
  • October 01, 2019: [Downward Departure]
  • October 01, 2019: [Exhibit to a Document]
  • October 01, 2019: [Plea Agreement Filed]
  • October 01, 2019: [Plea and Sentence]
  • October 01, 2019: [Waiver of Indictment]
September, 2019
  • September 23, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Substitution of Counsel]
August, 2019
  • August 20, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 20, 2019: [Interpreter Requested]
  • August 20, 2019: [Order on Motion for Waiver of Speedy Trial Act]
  • August 14, 2019: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • August 08, 2019: [Speedy Trial - Waive Speedy Trial]
  • August 08, 2019: [Information - Felony]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.