U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Delaware

delaware Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Delaware
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:19-cr-00104-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Gordillo Terraso
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
February, 2020
  • February 04, 2020: [Judgment]
  • February 03, 2020: [Sentencing]
January, 2020
  • January 23, 2020: [Exhibit to a Document]
  • January 22, 2020: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • January 17, 2020: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
November, 2019
  • November 20, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
October, 2019
  • October 03, 2019: [Order Scheduling Sentencing]
  • October 03, 2019: [~Util - Interpreter Requested]
  • October 03, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • October 02, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Substitution of Counsel]
September, 2019
  • September 16, 2019: [Order]
  • September 16, 2019: [~Util - Interpreter Requested]
  • September 16, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
August, 2019
  • August 22, 2019: [Order to Continue - Pretrial Motion Filing]
  • August 22, 2019: [Arraignment - Not Guilty Plea]
  • August 21, 2019: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • August 16, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 16, 2019: [Redacted Document]
  • August 16, 2019: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.