U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Delaware

delaware Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Delaware
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:19-cr-00105-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Arias Garcia
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2020
  • January 30, 2020: [Judgment]
  • January 29, 2020: [Sentencing]
  • January 21, 2020: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • January 15, 2020: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
October, 2019
  • October 16, 2019: [Order Scheduling Sentencing]
  • October 16, 2019: [~Util - Interpreter Requested]
  • October 16, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
September, 2019
  • September 23, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Substitution of Counsel]
  • September 19, 2019: [Order Scheduling Guilty Plea - Rule 11]
  • September 19, 2019: [~Util - Interpreter Requested]
August, 2019
  • August 22, 2019: [Order to Continue - Pretrial Motion Filing]
  • August 22, 2019: [Arraignment - Not Guilty Plea]
  • August 21, 2019: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • August 16, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 16, 2019: [Redacted Document]
  • August 16, 2019: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.