U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Delaware

delaware Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Delaware
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:19-cr-00103-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Sponaugle
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2025
  • March 27, 2025: [USCA Appeal Information on Post Decision Matters]
December, 2022
  • December 10, 2022: [--Transcript]
October, 2022
  • October 05, 2022: [- - Notice of Docketing ROA - 3rd Circuit]
  • October 01, 2022: [- NOTICE OF APPEAL- Final Judgment]
September, 2022
  • September 29, 2022: [Order]
  • September 29, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • September 26, 2022: [Stay]
  • September 21, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • September 19, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • September 19, 2022: [In Forma Pauperis]
  • September 16, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Document]
  • September 13, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • September 09, 2022: [In Forma Pauperis]
  • September 06, 2022: [Judgment]
  • September 06, 2022: [Opinion - Memorandum Opinion]
August, 2022
  • August 31, 2022: [Sentencing]
  • August 30, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • August 30, 2022: [Letter]
  • August 26, 2022: [Order]
  • August 25, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • August 23, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • August 15, 2022: [Order]
  • August 15, 2022: [Opinion]
  • August 10, 2022: [Letter]
  • August 09, 2022: [Letter]
  • August 04, 2022: [Order]
July, 2022
  • July 29, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • July 11, 2022: [--Transcript]
May, 2022
  • May 31, 2022: [Letter]
  • May 24, 2022: [Order Scheduling Sentencing]
  • May 03, 2022: [Letter]
March, 2022
  • March 31, 2022: [Letter]
  • March 21, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 21, 2022: [Order]
  • March 21, 2022: [Order Scheduling Sentencing]
  • March 15, 2022: [Status Report ]
  • March 14, 2022: [Evidentiary Hearing]
February, 2022
  • February 18, 2022: [Status Report ]
  • February 07, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
January, 2022
  • January 24, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • January 10, 2022: [Status Report ]
  • January 03, 2022: [Order Scheduling Sentencing]
  • January 03, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
December, 2021
  • December 29, 2021: [Status Report ]
  • December 27, 2021: [--Transcript]
  • December 17, 2021: [Status Conference - Deft. not present]
  • December 17, 2021: [Order for Jury Lunch]
  • December 16, 2021: [Letter]
  • December 15, 2021: [Redacted Document]
  • December 15, 2021: [Jury Verdict]
  • December 15, 2021: [Jury Instructions ]
  • December 15, 2021: [Verdict Sheet - Proposed]
  • December 08, 2021: [Letter]
  • December 07, 2021: [Jury Trial Held]
  • December 07, 2021: [Jury Instructions ]
  • December 06, 2021: [Jury Selection]
  • December 06, 2021: [Jury Instructions ]
  • December 02, 2021: [Letter]
  • December 02, 2021: [Voir Dire Questions]
November, 2021
  • November 29, 2021: [Order]
  • November 23, 2021: [Letter]
  • November 19, 2021: [Order on Motion in Limine]
  • November 18, 2021: [Stipulation]
  • November 17, 2021: [Pretrial Conference]
  • November 15, 2021: [Response to Motion]
  • November 10, 2021: [Jury Instructions - Proposed]
  • November 10, 2021: [In Limine]
October, 2021
  • October 20, 2021: [Order]
  • October 18, 2021: [Stipulation]
September, 2021
  • September 09, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
August, 2021
  • August 24, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 17, 2021: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • August 11, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • August 09, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • August 06, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
July, 2021
  • July 26, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • July 26, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • July 26, 2021: [Order]
  • July 26, 2021: [Sealed Document]
  • July 23, 2021: [Stipulation]
  • July 23, 2021: [Letter]
June, 2021
  • June 10, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • June 10, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 10, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • June 03, 2021: [Order]
  • June 03, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • June 03, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • June 01, 2021: [Status Report ]
May, 2021
  • May 14, 2021: [SO ORDERED - for stipulation only]
  • May 14, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • May 14, 2021: [Stipulation]
  • May 14, 2021: [Letter]
  • May 11, 2021: [Order Setting Response Deadline]
April, 2021
  • April 28, 2021: [Redacted Document]
  • April 28, 2021: [Compel]
  • April 06, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • April 06, 2021: [Order]
  • April 06, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • April 01, 2021: [Status Report ]
March, 2021
  • March 29, 2021: [Letter]
February, 2021
  • February 19, 2021: [Order]
  • February 19, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • February 19, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • February 16, 2021: [Status Report ]
December, 2020
  • December 18, 2020: [Order]
  • December 18, 2020: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • December 18, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • December 18, 2020: [Status Report ]
November, 2020
  • November 09, 2020: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 05, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
October, 2020
  • October 19, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • October 19, 2020: [Order]
  • October 19, 2020: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • October 19, 2020: [Status Report ]
August, 2020
  • August 28, 2020: [Order]
  • August 28, 2020: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • August 28, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • August 18, 2020: [Status Report ]
June, 2020
  • June 22, 2020: [Order]
  • June 22, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • June 22, 2020: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • June 19, 2020: [Status Report ]
  • June 18, 2020: [Order]
  • June 11, 2020: [Protective Order]
April, 2020
  • April 21, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • April 21, 2020: [Order]
  • April 21, 2020: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • April 20, 2020: [Status Report ]
February, 2020
  • February 21, 2020: [Order]
  • February 21, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • February 21, 2020: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • February 21, 2020: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • February 18, 2020: [Status Report ]
  • February 18, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
December, 2019
  • December 23, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • December 23, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • December 23, 2019: [Order]
  • December 23, 2019: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • December 20, 2019: [Letter]
November, 2019
  • November 25, 2019: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • November 25, 2019: [Oral Order]
  • November 25, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • November 22, 2019: [Letter]
  • November 08, 2019: [Response to Motion]
October, 2019
  • October 09, 2019: [Bill of Particulars]
  • October 09, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 09, 2019: [Order]
  • October 09, 2019: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • October 04, 2019: [Order]
  • October 04, 2019: [Order to Continue - Pretrial Motion Filing]
  • October 04, 2019: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • October 04, 2019: [Telephone Conference]
  • October 04, 2019: [Extension of Time to File Document]
August, 2019
  • August 26, 2019: [Order]
  • August 26, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 26, 2019: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • August 23, 2019: [Order to Continue - Pretrial Motion Filing]
  • August 23, 2019: [Arraignment - Not Guilty Plea]
  • August 23, 2019: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • August 23, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • August 22, 2019: [Acknowledgment of Receipt]
  • August 21, 2019: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • August 16, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 16, 2019: [Redacted Document]
  • August 16, 2019: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.