U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Delaware

delaware Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Delaware
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:19-cr-00106-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Palesky
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2020
  • November 09, 2020: [Acknowledgment of Receipt]
  • November 05, 2020: [Exit Record]
  • November 05, 2020: [Transfer Out/Probationer]
February, 2020
  • February 05, 2020: [Judgment]
  • February 04, 2020: [Sentencing]
January, 2020
  • January 22, 2020: [Letter]
  • January 09, 2020: [Redacted Document]
  • January 09, 2020: [Seal Document]
  • January 09, 2020: [Seal]
  • January 09, 2020: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
December, 2019
  • December 03, 2019: [Order Scheduling Sentencing]
  • December 02, 2019: [- CORRECTING ENTRY]
November, 2019
  • November 27, 2019: [Continue]
October, 2019
  • October 02, 2019: [Order Scheduling Sentencing]
September, 2019
  • September 26, 2019: [Redacted Document]
  • September 26, 2019: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • September 26, 2019: [Sealed Document]
  • September 26, 2019: [Plea Agreement Filed]
  • September 26, 2019: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • September 26, 2019: [Arraignment - Guilty Plea]
  • September 06, 2019: [Order on Motion for Waiver of Speedy Trial Act]
  • September 06, 2019: [Order Scheduling Guilty Plea - Rule 11]
  • September 05, 2019: [Remark]
  • September 05, 2019: [Certificate of Good Standing]
  • September 05, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
August, 2019
  • August 21, 2019: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • August 20, 2019: [Speedy Trial - Waive Speedy Trial]
  • August 20, 2019: [Information - Felony]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.