U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Delaware

delaware Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Delaware
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:19-cr-00109-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Blackshear
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
February, 2021
  • February 24, 2021: [Judgment]
  • February 18, 2021: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • February 16, 2021: [Dismiss]
  • February 16, 2021: [Sentencing]
January, 2021
  • January 05, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • January 04, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
December, 2020
  • December 30, 2020: [- CORRECTING ENTRY]
  • December 30, 2020: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • December 18, 2020: [Order Scheduling Sentencing]
  • December 18, 2020: [Order]
  • December 18, 2020: [Continue]
  • December 18, 2020: [Telephone Conference]
  • December 15, 2020: [Oral Order]
  • December 15, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 02, 2020: [Order Scheduling Sentencing]
November, 2020
  • November 30, 2020: [Letter]
  • November 16, 2020: [CJA 20 - Oral Appointment]
  • November 13, 2020: [Order Scheduling Sentencing]
  • November 12, 2020: [Exhibit to a Document]
  • November 10, 2020: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • November 10, 2020: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • November 09, 2020: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • November 09, 2020: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
August, 2020
  • August 14, 2020: [Order Scheduling Sentencing]
May, 2020
  • May 26, 2020: [Order Scheduling Sentencing]
  • May 26, 2020: [Order]
  • May 22, 2020: [Continue]
February, 2020
  • February 25, 2020: [Order Scheduling Sentencing]
  • February 13, 2020: [Order Scheduling Sentencing]
  • February 12, 2020: [Sealed Document]
  • February 12, 2020: [Plea Agreement Filed]
  • February 12, 2020: [Plea Hearing - Plea Accepted]
January, 2020
  • January 08, 2020: [Order Scheduling Guilty Plea - Rule 11]
November, 2019
  • November 26, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Substitution of Counsel]
  • November 26, 2019: [Order]
  • November 26, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • November 26, 2019: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • November 25, 2019: [Extension of Time to File Document]
  • November 08, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • November 08, 2019: [Order]
  • November 08, 2019: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • November 07, 2019: [Extension of Time to File Document]
October, 2019
  • October 07, 2019: [Order]
  • October 07, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • October 07, 2019: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • October 04, 2019: [Extension of Time to File Document]
September, 2019
  • September 10, 2019: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • September 05, 2019: [Protective Order]
  • September 05, 2019: [Order to Continue - Pretrial Motion Filing]
  • September 05, 2019: [Arraignment - Not Guilty Plea]
  • September 04, 2019: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
August, 2019
  • August 28, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 28, 2019: [Redacted Document]
  • August 28, 2019: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.