U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Delaware

delaware Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Delaware
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:19-cr-00110-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Gibbs
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2020
  • October 16, 2020: [Judgment]
  • October 15, 2020: [Sentencing]
  • October 06, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
September, 2020
  • September 30, 2020: [Sealed Document]
  • September 29, 2020: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
June, 2020
  • June 24, 2020: [Order]
  • June 24, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 23, 2020: [Status Report ]
May, 2020
  • May 22, 2020: [Order]
  • May 22, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 20, 2020: [Status Report ]
  • May 13, 2020: [Oral Order]
March, 2020
  • March 17, 2020: [Order]
  • March 17, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 16, 2020: [Continue]
  • March 11, 2020: [Declaration]
January, 2020
  • January 30, 2020: [Order]
  • January 29, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 29, 2020: [Order]
  • January 29, 2020: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • January 28, 2020: [Continue]
  • January 28, 2020: [- CORRECTING ENTRY]
  • January 22, 2020: [Forfeiture - Preliminary Order]
November, 2019
  • November 25, 2019: [Order Scheduling Sentencing]
  • November 22, 2019: [Exhibit to a Document]
  • November 22, 2019: [Plea Agreement Filed]
  • November 22, 2019: [Plea Hearing - Plea Accepted]
  • November 22, 2019: [Waiver of Indictment]
September, 2019
  • September 11, 2019: [Order]
  • September 11, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 04, 2019: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • September 03, 2019: [Information - Felony]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.