U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Delaware

delaware Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Delaware
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:19-cr-00111-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Velasquez Santizo
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2019
  • November 26, 2019: [Judgment]
  • November 26, 2019: [Sentencing]
  • November 26, 2019: [- CORRECTING ENTRY]
  • November 26, 2019: [Order on Motion for Downward Departure]
  • November 26, 2019: [Downward Departure]
  • November 26, 2019: [Exhibit to a Document]
  • November 26, 2019: [Plea Agreement Filed]
  • November 26, 2019: [Plea Hearing - Plea Accepted]
  • November 26, 2019: [Waiver of Indictment]
October, 2019
  • October 08, 2019: [Order]
  • October 08, 2019: [~Util - Interpreter Requested]
  • October 08, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 07, 2019: [Continue]
  • October 03, 2019: [Order]
  • October 03, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 03, 2019: [~Util - Interpreter Requested]
  • October 03, 2019: [Continue]
September, 2019
  • September 24, 2019: [Order]
  • September 24, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • September 24, 2019: [~Util - Interpreter Requested]
  • September 12, 2019: [Speedy Trial - Waive Speedy Trial]
  • September 11, 2019: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • September 10, 2019: [Information - Felony]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.