open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Delaware

DELAWARE PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Delaware
    Case Number:1:19-cv-01697
    Party Name:Pauly v. Sterling Bancorp
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Terminate Civil Case]
    Date Published:November 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Stipulation of Dismissal]
    Date Published:November 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [- CORRECTING ENTRY]
    Date Published:November 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Voluntary Dismissal]
    Date Published:November 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Oral Order]
    Date Published:November 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [1 - Terminate Hearings]
    Date Published:November 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Letter]
    Date Published:November 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order Setting Scheduling Conference]
    Date Published:October 23, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Answer to Complaint]
    Date Published:October 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:October 09, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set/Reset Answer Deadline]
    Date Published:October 09, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Stipulation to EXTEND Time]
    Date Published:October 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Appearance]
    Date Published:October 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Default (Request for Clerk's Entry of Default)]
    Date Published:October 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
    Date Published:September 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons Returned Executed]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons Issued]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Complaint]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Magistrate Consent Forms]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.ded.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?69984
Post Your Comment or Question
3 x 3 =