open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Delaware

DELAWARE PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Delaware
    Case Number:1:19-cv-01695
    Party Name:Diebold, Incorporated et al v. Nautilus Hyosung Inc. et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [Proposed Order]
    Date Published:February 13, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:January 30, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Letter]
    Date Published:January 29, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Disclosure Statement - Rule 7.1]
    Date Published:November 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Answer to Amended Complaint]
    Date Published:November 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [SO ORDERED]
    Date Published:October 04, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
    Date Published:October 04, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Stipulation to EXTEND Time]
    Date Published:October 04, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Complaint - Amended]
    Date Published:September 27, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Appearance]
    Date Published:September 27, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
    Date Published:September 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Local Counsel Letter]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Case Transferred In from other District - Case Opening Event]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.ded.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?69981
Post Your Comment or Question
4 x 1 =