open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Delaware

DELAWARE PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Delaware
    Case Number:1:19-cv-01700
    Party Name:Aviles v. Ladd et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set/Reset Answer Deadline]
    Date Published:October 28, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Status Report]
    Date Published:October 24, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Oral Order]
    Date Published:October 21, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons Returned Executed]
    Date Published:September 24, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons Issued]
    Date Published:September 23, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
    Date Published:September 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Complaint]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Magistrate Consent Forms]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [No Summons Issued]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.ded.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?69992
Post Your Comment or Question
6 x 1 =