U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Delaware

delaware Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Delaware
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:19-cr-00114-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Gomez Bravo
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2019
  • November 14, 2019: [Judgment]
  • November 08, 2019: [Order on Motion for Downward Departure]
  • November 08, 2019: [Downward Departure]
  • November 08, 2019: [Plea Agreement Filed]
  • November 08, 2019: [Sealed Document]
  • November 08, 2019: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • November 07, 2019: [Plea and Sentence]
September, 2019
  • September 20, 2019: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • September 20, 2019: [Order]
  • September 20, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 20, 2019: [~Util - Interpreter Requested]
  • September 18, 2019: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • September 17, 2019: [Speedy Trial - Waive Speedy Trial]
  • September 17, 2019: [Information - Felony]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.