U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Delaware

delaware Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Delaware
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:19-cr-00116-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Austin
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
September, 2021
  • September 01, 2021: [Order - Memorandum and Order]
May, 2021
  • May 19, 2021: [Notice of Service]
  • May 19, 2021: [Response to Motion]
April, 2021
  • April 28, 2021: [Order]
  • April 28, 2021: [Reduce Sentence - USSC Amendment - 18:3582c2]
  • April 23, 2021: [Remark]
  • April 22, 2021: [Order on Motion to Reduce Sentence- USSC Amendment -18:3582c2]
  • April 22, 2021: [Reduce Sentence - USSC Amendment - 18:3582c2]
September, 2020
  • September 15, 2020: [Judgment]
  • September 10, 2020: [Sentencing]
July, 2020
  • July 09, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
April, 2020
  • April 23, 2020: [Order]
  • April 23, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 23, 2020: [Status Report ]
March, 2020
  • March 11, 2020: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • March 04, 2020: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • March 04, 2020: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • March 04, 2020: [Seal Document]
January, 2020
  • January 10, 2020: [Order]
  • January 10, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • January 10, 2020: [- CORRECTING ENTRY]
  • January 09, 2020: [Continue]
October, 2019
  • October 22, 2019: [Order Scheduling Sentencing]
  • October 22, 2019: [Exhibit to a Document]
  • October 22, 2019: [Plea Agreement Filed]
  • October 22, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • October 22, 2019: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • October 03, 2019: [Oral Order]
  • October 03, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 02, 2019: [Order Scheduling Guilty Plea - Rule 11]
  • October 02, 2019: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
September, 2019
  • September 25, 2019: [Information - Felony]
  • September 25, 2019: [Redacted Document]
  • September 25, 2019: [Case Unsealed]
  • September 25, 2019: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
  • September 25, 2019: [Unseal Case]
  • September 25, 2019: [Criminal Complaint Unsealed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.