U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Delaware

delaware Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Delaware
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:19-cr-00120-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Mulvihill
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2020
  • May 04, 2020: [Order]
  • May 04, 2020: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • May 01, 2020: [Continue]
February, 2020
  • February 25, 2020: [SO ORDERED - Probation Petition only]
  • February 25, 2020: [Probation Petition re Revocation of Probation]
January, 2020
  • January 09, 2020: [Order Scheduling Sentencing]
  • January 07, 2020: [Order]
  • January 07, 2020: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • January 07, 2020: [Plea Agreement Filed]
  • January 07, 2020: [Sealed Document]
  • January 07, 2020: [Arraignment - Guilty Plea]
  • January 07, 2020: [Waiver of Indictment]
December, 2019
  • December 10, 2019: [Order Scheduling Guilty Plea - Rule 11]
  • December 10, 2019: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
November, 2019
  • November 15, 2019: [Status Report ]
  • November 12, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • November 12, 2019: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • November 12, 2019: [Order]
  • November 12, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • November 12, 2019: [Continue]
  • November 04, 2019: [Order Scheduling Guilty Plea - Rule 11]
  • November 04, 2019: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
October, 2019
  • October 23, 2019: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • October 21, 2019: [Information - Felony]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.