U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Delaware

delaware Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Delaware
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:19-cr-00121-1
  • Case Name: USA v. DeJesus
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2022
  • March 23, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Substitution of Counsel]
August, 2021
  • August 05, 2021: [Probation Petition re Revocation of Supervised Release]
September, 2020
  • September 02, 2020: [Set/Reset Hearings]
August, 2020
  • August 11, 2020: [Probation Petition re Revocation of Supervised Release]
July, 2020
  • July 21, 2020: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • July 17, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • July 15, 2020: [Oral Order]
  • July 15, 2020: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • July 14, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • July 08, 2020: [Order]
  • July 08, 2020: [Order of Detention - Temporary Detention]
  • July 08, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 08, 2020: [Detain Pending Trial]
  • July 08, 2020: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • July 08, 2020: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • July 08, 2020: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • July 07, 2020: [SO ORDERED - Probation Petition only]
  • July 07, 2020: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • July 07, 2020: [Modify Conditions of Release]
November, 2019
  • November 06, 2019: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • November 05, 2019: [Pleadings from Other District - Rule 5c3 - formerly rule 40]
  • November 05, 2019: [Transfer In/Supervised Release]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.