U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Delaware

delaware Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Delaware
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:19-cr-00122-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Fleming
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2021
  • November 29, 2021: [Order]
  • November 29, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 01, 2021: [Judgment]
October, 2021
  • October 27, 2021: [Sentencing]
  • October 27, 2021: [Order]
  • October 27, 2021: [Dismiss]
  • October 25, 2021: [Letter]
  • October 21, 2021: [Redacted Document]
  • October 20, 2021: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • October 15, 2021: [Redacted Document]
September, 2021
  • September 08, 2021: [Order]
  • September 08, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
August, 2021
  • August 25, 2021: [Order]
  • August 25, 2021: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • August 25, 2021: [Continue]
June, 2021
  • June 23, 2021: [Order Scheduling Sentencing]
  • June 16, 2021: [Status Report ]
May, 2021
  • May 17, 2021: [Status Report ]
April, 2021
  • April 15, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • April 14, 2021: [Status Report ]
March, 2021
  • March 15, 2021: [Status Report ]
February, 2021
  • February 12, 2021: [Order]
  • February 12, 2021: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • February 12, 2021: [Continue]
November, 2020
  • November 12, 2020: [Order]
  • November 12, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 10, 2020: [Continue]
September, 2020
  • September 11, 2020: [- CORRECTING ENTRY]
August, 2020
  • August 26, 2020: [Order Scheduling Sentencing]
  • August 26, 2020: [Sealed Document]
  • August 26, 2020: [Plea Agreement Filed]
  • August 26, 2020: [Plea Hearing - Plea Accepted]
May, 2020
  • May 26, 2020: [Order]
  • May 26, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 26, 2020: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • May 20, 2020: [Exclude]
April, 2020
  • April 17, 2020: [Order]
  • April 17, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 17, 2020: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • April 03, 2020: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
March, 2020
  • March 13, 2020: [Status Report ]
February, 2020
  • February 03, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • February 03, 2020: [Oral Order]
  • February 03, 2020: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • February 03, 2020: [Telephone Conference]
January, 2020
  • January 27, 2020: [Order]
  • January 27, 2020: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • January 27, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
December, 2019
  • December 11, 2019: [Order to Continue - Pretrial Motion Filing]
  • December 11, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • December 09, 2019: [Extension of Time to File Document]
November, 2019
  • November 21, 2019: [Order to Continue - Pretrial Motion Filing]
  • November 21, 2019: [Arraignment - Not Guilty Plea]
  • November 21, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • November 20, 2019: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • November 18, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • November 15, 2019: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • November 15, 2019: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • November 15, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • November 13, 2019: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • November 06, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 05, 2019: [Redacted Document]
  • November 05, 2019: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.