open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Delaware

DELAWARE PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Delaware
    Case Number:1:19-cv-02109
    Party Name:DIFF Scale Operation Research, LLC v. MaxLinear, Inc. et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [Stipulation-General (See Motion List for Stipulation to Extend Time)]
    Date Published:May 29, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Objections]
    Date Published:May 21, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Service]
    Date Published:May 13, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Report and Recommendations]
    Date Published:May 07, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Scheduling Order - Patent]
    Date Published:April 29, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Proposed Order]
    Date Published:April 28, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Scheduling Conference]
    Date Published:April 27, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order Setting Scheduling Conference]
    Date Published:April 17, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Letter]
    Date Published:March 05, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Brief - Reply]
    Date Published:February 20, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Brief - Answering Brief in Opposition]
    Date Published:February 13, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
    Date Published:February 04, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Motions Referred]
    Date Published:February 04, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Oral Order]
    Date Published:February 04, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Brief - Opening Brief in Support]
    Date Published:January 31, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Dismiss/Fail to State Claim]
    Date Published:January 31, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Set/Reset Answer Deadline]
    Date Published:January 10, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Stipulation to EXTEND Time]
    Date Published:January 07, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Appearance]
    Date Published:December 05, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [SO ORDERED]
    Date Published:December 04, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set/Reset Answer Deadline]
    Date Published:December 04, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Extension of Time to -]
    Date Published:December 04, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
    Date Published:November 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons Returned Executed]
    Date Published:November 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
    Date Published:November 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons Issued]
    Date Published:November 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Magistrate Consent Forms]
    Date Published:November 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Patent/Trademark Report to Commissioner of Patents]
    Date Published:November 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Complaint]
    Date Published:November 08, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.ded.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?70572
Post Your Comment or Question
3 x 3 =