open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Delaware

DELAWARE PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Delaware
    Case Number:1:19-cv-02110
    Party Name:Blackbird Tech LLC v. Rite Aid Corporation
  • Filing Type:Civil [Motions No Longer Referred ]
    Date Published:May 27, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Miscellaneous Relief]
    Date Published:May 26, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Claim Construction Chart]
    Date Published:May 26, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Stipulation-General (See Motion List for Stipulation to Extend Time)]
    Date Published:April 09, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Protective Order]
    Date Published:March 12, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [- CORRECTING ENTRY]
    Date Published:March 12, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Service]
    Date Published:February 27, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Oral Order]
    Date Published:February 20, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Case Referred to Mediation - Magistrate Judge only]
    Date Published:February 20, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Set/Reset Hearings]
    Date Published:February 13, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Scheduling Order - Patent]
    Date Published:February 13, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order - -Memorandum and Order]
    Date Published:February 07, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set Deadlines]
    Date Published:February 07, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Proposed Order]
    Date Published:February 06, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Add Attorneys - PHV only]
    Date Published:January 24, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order Setting Scheduling Conference]
    Date Published:January 15, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
    Date Published:January 09, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Appearance]
    Date Published:January 08, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Answer to Complaint]
    Date Published:January 08, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [SO ORDERED]
    Date Published:December 09, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set/Reset Answer Deadline]
    Date Published:December 09, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Stipulation to EXTEND Time]
    Date Published:December 06, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons Returned Executed]
    Date Published:December 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
    Date Published:November 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Disclosure Statement - Rule 7.1]
    Date Published:November 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons Issued]
    Date Published:November 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Patent/Trademark Report to Commissioner of Patents]
    Date Published:November 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Magistrate Consent Forms]
    Date Published:November 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Complaint]
    Date Published:November 08, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.ded.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?70570
Post Your Comment or Question
5 x 1 =