U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Delaware

delaware Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Delaware
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:19-cr-00124-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Alcoser-Esquivel
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2020
  • January 22, 2020: [Judgment]
  • January 14, 2020: [Order on Motion for Downward Departure]
  • January 14, 2020: [Downward Departure]
  • January 14, 2020: [Sealed Document]
  • January 14, 2020: [Plea Agreement Filed]
  • January 14, 2020: [Plea and Sentence]
  • January 14, 2020: [Waiver of Indictment]
November, 2019
  • November 20, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • November 19, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 19, 2019: [Order]
  • November 19, 2019: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • November 19, 2019: [~Util - Interpreter Requested]
  • November 13, 2019: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • November 08, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 08, 2019: [Speedy Trial - Waive Speedy Trial]
  • November 08, 2019: [Information - Felony]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.