open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Delaware

DELAWARE PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Delaware
    Case Number:1:19-cv-02111
    Party Name:McCombs v. Trans Union, LLC et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Service]
    Date Published:February 11, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Settlement]
    Date Published:February 06, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order Setting Teleconference]
    Date Published:January 29, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Case Referred to Mediation - Magistrate Judge only]
    Date Published:January 29, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Scheduling Order - General]
    Date Published:January 29, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Proposed Order]
    Date Published:January 29, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Oral Order]
    Date Published:January 09, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set/Reset Answer Deadline]
    Date Published:December 05, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Stipulation to EXTEND Time]
    Date Published:December 05, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Answer to Complaint]
    Date Published:December 05, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Add Attorneys - PHV only]
    Date Published:December 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [SO ORDERED]
    Date Published:November 26, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
    Date Published:November 25, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Disclosure Statement - Rule 7.1]
    Date Published:November 25, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
    Date Published:November 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Magistrate Consent Forms]
    Date Published:November 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons Issued]
    Date Published:November 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Complaint]
    Date Published:November 08, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.ded.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?70573
Post Your Comment or Question
6 x 1 =